+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor