+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Testimony taken in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor