+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed