+ − Actions (19)
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor