+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (65)
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed without the Governor's signature
- Effective immediately
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/19/2021
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
- Read first time
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Amendment withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/21/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor