+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/30/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor