+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Economic Development
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Filed