+ − Actions (19)
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Filed