+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Received from the House
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/26/2019
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor