+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Correction in referral
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On November 13, 2012 in the House:
- Filed