+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor