+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Record vote
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor