+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/29/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor