+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in Calendars
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On November 13, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor