+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Filed