+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 1/1/14
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (5)
Turner, Chris
Type:
Primary Sponsor