+ − Actions (32)
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Subcommittee meeting cancelled
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Considered in public hearing
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On April 13, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Filed