+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 1/1/14
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
- Referred to Jurisprudence
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Patrick, Diane
Type:
Primary Sponsor