+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (66)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Record vote
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Amendment withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Filed