+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Considered in public hearing
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On November 10, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor