+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/13/2019
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor