+ − Actions (29)
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor