+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor