+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed