+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/21/2019
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor