+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/22/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
- Read first time
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed