+ − Actions (20)
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor