+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/24/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
- Read first time
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed