+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/11
On May 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 15, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 7, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On November 8, 2010 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor