+ − Actions (53)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Natural Resources
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Postponed in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Filed