+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Reported favorably as amended
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On November 13, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor