+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (71)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Motion to concur in Senate amdmts. withdrawn
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to committee
- Motion to recommit to committee
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
- Read first time
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Bonnen, Dennis
Type:
Primary Sponsor