+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/20/2019
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor