+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor