+ − Actions (23)
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Correction in referral
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor