+ − Actions (22)
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Filed