+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Amendment fails of adoption
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/25/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor