+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Government Transparency & Operation
- Read first time
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed