+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Passed
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/4/2021
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/16/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor