+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (149)
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Left pending in committee
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Motion to table fails
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment withdrawn
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment as amended withdrawn
- Amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Point of order overruled
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Point of order withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment to amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment amended
- Amendment to amendment withdrawn
- Amendment tabled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment as amended fails of adoption
- Amendment as amended withdrawn
- Record vote
- Amendment amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment as amended tabled
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Filed