+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Filed