+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/17/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor