+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor