+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor