+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor