+ − Actions (13)
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor