+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
- Corrected comm. report distributed
- Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Filed