+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (194)
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- See remarks for effective date
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- House adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed as amended
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Amended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Amendment(s) offered
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Record vote
- Calendars Committee rule adopted
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommitted to committee
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/23/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor