+ − Actions (48)
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/09
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Filed