+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (63)
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/21
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/17/2021
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/18/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed